Global Patent Index - EP 0972879 A2

EP 0972879 A2 2000-01-19 - Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (en)

Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (de)

Kalanderanordnung für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Calandre pour bandes de papier ou analogue

Publication

EP 0972879 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111849 A

Priority

DE 19832065 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly, for processing webs of paper and similar materials, has angled columns (16) supported at the top and bottom. They carry five rollers on axes parallel to the columns, on a common plane (E) at an angle to the horizontal. The columns (16) are supported from above and below by horizontal mounting surfaces (36, 38) secured to the building, formed by concrete foundation sections (40, 41). An upper support surface (37) for the columns (16) is at a support foot (39), near the upper end of the column (16). A lower support surface (35) is formed directly at the column (16). The common plane (E) for the rollers is pitched at an angle of 30-60 degrees to the horizontal, or 45 degrees . The columns (16) for the calender rollers are located between the final drying cylinder (42) and a web winder (43), at their levels. The calender rollers are on the upper side of the columns (16), and at least one roller (6) can be moved by a setting unit (49) at right angles to the roller plane (E).

Abstract (de)

Eine Kalanderanordnung für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material weist einen unten abgestützten Ständer (16) und mindestens fünf daran gehaltenen Walzen (4 bis 13) auf, deren Achsen in einer etwa parallel zum Ständer (16) verlaufenden, gemeinsamen Ebene (E) liegen. Die gemeinsame Ebene (E) verläuft schräg zur Horizontalen. Der Ständer (16) ist nicht nur am unteren Ende, sondern auch oben abgestützt. Hierdurch wird die Schwingungsneigung des Ständers verringert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0293 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972879 A2 20000119; EP 0972879 A3 20000223; EP 0972879 B1 20030502; AT 239133 T 20030515; CA 2277593 A1 20000116; CA 2277593 C 20040224; DE 19832065 A1 20000120; EP 0979896 A2 20000216; EP 0979896 A3 20000223; EP 0979896 B1 20021106; US 6247398 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 239133 T

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905287

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140620

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905287

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905287 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020111

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI