Global patent index - EP 0972880 A2

EP 0972880 A2 2000-01-19 - Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (en)

Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (de)

Kalander für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Calandre pour bandes de papier ou analogue

Publication

EP 0972880 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111850 A

Priority

DE 19832064 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly, to process a web of paper and similar materials, has rollers with an adjustable bend, and all the bending rollers (4,8,9,13) are a lifting mantle type on carriers fixed to the frame. The uppermost intermediate rollers (5,10) in each roller stack are fixed to the frame. The lower roller (8) of the first roller stack (2) in the calendar assembly and the upper roller (9) of the second roller stack (3) are next to each other, and can form an additional closing nip (34) through the lifting mantle action. The roller bending adjustment system has a support row which can be moved by 180 degrees by a setting unit (22) with a lifting guide. The second and third intermediate rollers (6,7,11,12) in each roller stack are mounted on levers (27) which pivot on axes fitted to the machine frame. In both stacks of rollers (2,3), the upper rollers (4,9) and the center intermediate rollers (6,11) and the lower rollers (8,13) have elastic mantle claddings. The other rollers (5,7,10,12) are heated rollers with hard mantles. The entry feed unit (45) directs the web through all the nips (25-33) in both roller stacks (2,3) and the additional nip (34). All the rollers (4-13) in both roller stacks (2,3) have their own drives (46). The calender rollers lie on a common plane (E) at an angle of 45 degrees to the horizontal, on columns (16) supported at the top and bottom on mounting surfaces (35,36) formed by the concrete foundation sections (40,41). The calender rollers are on the upper side of the columns (16), and at least one roller can be moved by a setting unit (49) at right angles to the roller plane (E). The bearing mounting for the carrier of at least one roller with an adjustable bend has an eccentric, which can reduce the gap between adjacent adjustable bend rollers (8,9). The eccentric is rotated with the carrier by the setting unit (22). The calender assembly is located between the final drying cylinder (42) and the web winding station (43), and at their levels.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kalander (1) für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material besitzt zwei an einem Ständer (16) in einer gemeinsamen Ebene (E) angeordnete Walzenstapel (2, 3). Jeder Walzenstapel weist eine Oberwalze (4, 9), eine Unterwalze (8, 13) und drei Zwischenwalzen (5-7, 10-12) auf. Ober- und Unterwalzen (4, 8, 9, 13) sind als Durchbiegungseinstellwalze mit einem Mantel ausgebildet, der über eine Durchbiegungseinstellvorrichtung auf einem drehfest gehaltenen Träger abgestützt ist. Alle Durchbiegungseinstellwalzen (4, 8, 9, 13) sind vom Mantelhub-Typ. Ihre Träger sind ständerfest gelagert. Auch die obersten Zwischenwalzen (5, 10) sind ständerfest gelagert. Die Unterwalze (8) des ersten Walzenstapels (2) und die Oberwalze (9) des zweiten Walzenstapels (3) sind einander benachbart und können unter Ausnutzung des Mantelhubs einen geschlossenen Zusatznip (34) bilden. Die Wirkrichtung der Durchbiegungseinstelleinrichtung (15) weist wahlweise zum zugehörigen Walzenstapel oder zum anderen Walzenstapel. Auf diese Weise ist der Kalander für die Produktion einer Vielzahl unterschiedlicher Papierqualitäten geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972880 A2 20000119; EP 0972880 A3 20000517; EP 0972880 B1 20030502; AT 239134 T 20030515; CA 2277424 A1 20000116; CA 2277424 C 20040217; DE 19832064 A1 20000120; DE 19832064 C2 20000907; US 6325960 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060619

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060620

2006-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050606

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-07-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI