Global patent index - EP 0972885 A1

EP 0972885 A1 2000-01-19 - Tilting roof window

Title (en)

Tilting roof window

Title (de)

Schwingflügel-Dachfenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre de toiture basculante

Publication

EP 0972885 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112507 A

Priority

DE 19832262 A

Abstract (en)

A tilt action window for mounting into a sloping roof has the opening window frame (3) attached to hinged control arms (10) to allow a tilt and slide action in the fixed window frame (2) with pegs (14) in the opening frame sliding along grooves (29) in the fixed frame. The tilt action is balanced by spring arms (18). The fully open setting is further supported by curved sections (14) of the grooves to hold the pins. The holding profiles, of the grooves, are asymmetric and the pins are moved through the profiles, in either direction, by manual effort.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Dachfenster insbesondere Schwingflügel-Dachfenster (1), mit einem Blendrahmen (2) und einem Flügelrahmen (3), der mittels gelenkig an ihm angeordneten Hilfsrahmenprofilen (10) um eine Schwingachse (12) schwenkbeweglich gelagert ist, wobei die Schwingachse (12) horizontal verläuft und sich etwa im mittigen Bereich am Flügelrahmen (3) befindet und mit einem, mindestens an einem der Längsholme des Flügelrahmens (3) angeordneten Führungselement (14), das sich beim Schwingöffnen des Flügelrahmens (3) entlang einer am Blendrahmen (2) ausgebildeten Führungsbahn (15) bewegt, die in bezug zur Ebene der Oberseite des Blendrahmens (2) auf unterschiedlichen Höhenniveaus liegt. Es ist vorgesehen, daß die Führungsbahn (15) zwischen ihren beiden Endbereichen (32,33) mindestens eine den Flügelrahmen (3) in gewünschter Schwingöffnungsstellung haltende Höhenumlenkung (34) für das Führungselement (14) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/035; E05D 15/40; E05D 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2006.01); E05D 15/40 (2006.01); E05D 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/406 (2013.01); E04D 13/0357 (2013.01); E04D 13/0358 (2013.01); E05D 15/48 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/214 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/426 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/478 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/152 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972885 A1 20000119; EP 0972885 B1 20040915; AT 276411 T 20041015; DE 19832262 A1 20000120; DE 59910492 D1 20041021; DK 0972885 T3 20041206

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 276411

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110704

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910492

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030416

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI