Global Patent Index - EP 0972886 A3

EP 0972886 A3 2000-02-23 - Roof gutter

Title (en)

Roof gutter

Title (de)

Dachrinne

Title (fr)

Gouttière de toiture

Publication

EP 0972886 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109162 A

Priority

DE 29812684 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972886A2] A bar-like projection (10) is provided on the side of a roof gutter (8) remote from the pitched roof to which it is attached. The projection is preferably located at the upper edge (9) of the gutter. In a preferred arrangement, the projection can be located at a rolled-over top edge of the gutter. Projections preferably extend over the whole length of the gutter and slope at an angle of 60 deg. to the horizontal or less. They can be formed integrally with the gutter or can form a separate component which is attached by fasteners to the gutter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/064

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/064 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812684 U1 19981029; EP 0972886 A2 20000119; EP 0972886 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030430

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000812

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI