Global patent index - EP 0972895 A2

EP 0972895 A2 2000-01-19 - Locking mechanism

Title (en)

Locking mechanism

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0972895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112922 A

Priority

DE 19831944 A

Abstract (en)

In the cylinder housing (2), the cylinder core (5) is rotatably located from a locking to an unlocking position of the lock cylinder (3). The lock cylinder (3) is at least connected with a lever housing (11) which has a driver (12) for control of a lock. The lock cylinder and the lever housing, both in the unlocking and locking position of the lock cylinder, are axially displaceably arranged.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schließvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge mit in einem Zylindergehäuse (2) angeordneten Schließzylinder (3), der einen Zylinderkern (5) und eine Zylinderbuchse (4) umfaßt, in welcher der Zylinderkern (5) von einer Verriegelungs- in eine Entriegelungsstellung des Schließzylinders (3) drehbar gelagert ist. Um auf einfache Weise zu erreichen, daß eine axiale Verschiebung des Schließzylinders (3) und des Hebelgehäuses (11) bei der Drehung des Schließzylinders von der Ent- in die Verriegelungsstellung vermieden wird, schlägt die Erfindung vor, an dem Hebelgehäuse (11) außenseitig einen ersten Nocken (15) und an einem um das Hebelgehäuse (11) außenseitig herumgeführten Teil (16) des Zylindergehäuses (2) einen zweiten Nocken (17) anzuordnen, derart, daß der erste Nocken (15) sowohl in der Ent- als auch in der Verriegelungsstellung des Schließzylinders (3) bei einer axialen Verschiebung des Schließzylinders mitverschoben wird, und daß in der zwischen der Ent- und der Verriegelungsstellung befindlichen Stellung des Schließzylinders (3) der zweite Nocken (17) ein axiale Verschiebung des ersten Nockens (15) verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 85/10 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 13/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831944 C1 19990826; EP 0972895 A2 20000119; EP 0972895 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030712

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 17/00 A, 7E 05B 13/10 B, 7E 05B 65/19 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI