Global patent index - EP 0972895 A3

EP 0972895 A3 2001-03-28 - Locking mechanism

Title (en)

Locking mechanism

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0972895 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112922 A

Priority

DE 19831944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831944C1] In the cylinder housing (2), the cylinder core (5) is rotatably located from a locking to an unlocking position of the lock cylinder (3). The lock cylinder (3) is at least connected with a lever housing (11) which has a driver (12) for control of a lock. The lock cylinder and the lever housing, both in the unlocking and locking position of the lock cylinder, are axially displaceably arranged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00; E05B 13/10; E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 85/10 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 13/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831944 C1 19990826; EP 0972895 A2 20000119; EP 0972895 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030712

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 17/00 A, 7E 05B 13/10 B, 7E 05B 65/19 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI