Global Patent Index - EP 0972896 A1

EP 0972896 A1 2000-01-19 - Cylinder lock

Title (en)

Cylinder lock

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 0972896 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112307 A

Priority

DE 19831846 A

Abstract (en)

A security design cylinder lock has the lock cylinder (7) fitted onto a support mounting (5) which is selected to fit the gap between the end plates (3,4) of the lock housing, ie. to match the thickness of the door using a universal lock. The cylinder is attached to the mounting by shear pins (15,16) and with an angled thrust face (18) between the cylinder and the mounting. If an excessive axial force is applied to the cylinder the thrust faces cause the cylinder to twist on its axis and break the shear pins. The twist action jams the cylinder inside the lock housing and prevents further forcing of the lock.

Abstract (de)

Ein in einem Schloßkasten (1) zu befestigender Schließzylinder (2) mit einem auf einer Verbindungsbrücke (5) angeordneten Zylindergehäuse (6) hat eine Führungseinrichtung (17) mit einer Auflaufschräge (18). Bei einem Ziehen eines in dem Zylindergehäuse (6) drehbeweglich und axial unverschieblich angeordneten Zylinderkerns (11) wird das Zylindergehäuse (6) entlang der Auflautschräge (18) geführt. Hierdurch verkeilt sich der Schließzylinder (2) in dem Schloßkasten (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/20; E05B 9/08; E05B 9/10; E05B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 9/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/042 (2013.01); E05B 9/084 (2013.01); E05B 17/2084 (2013.01); E05B 17/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972896 A1 20000119; EP 0972896 B1 20030820; AT 247755 T 20030915; DE 19831846 A1 20000120; ES 2207078 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160626

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247755 T

- Effective date: 20160626

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140626

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070626

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070626

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AUG. *WINKHAUS G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207078 T3

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906649 P 20030925

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI