Global Patent Index - EP 0972898 A1

EP 0972898 A1 2000-01-19 - Safety system for a vehicle opening comprising improved connecting means

Title (en)

Safety system for a vehicle opening comprising improved connecting means

Title (de)

Sicherheitssystem für eine Kraftfahrzeugöffnung mit verbesserten Verbindungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Systeme de securite pour un ouvrant de vehicule automobile comportant des moyens de raccordement perfectionnes

Publication

EP 0972898 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99112521 A

Priority

FR 9809190 A

Abstract (en)

The security system comprises a transducer (14) that can transmit of receive an electromagnetic signal. Part of the system is contained within an internal unit (24) that is located within the vehicle body panel (10). An external (26) unit that slides within this unit houses the transducer. A printed command circuit (20) contains contacts (46) that correspond to contacts (44) located on the transducer. Connecting the contact completes the circuit and controls the locking of the door.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un système de sécurité pour un ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant au moins un capteur (14) susceptible d'émettre ou de recevoir un signal électromagnétique pour détecter à distance la présence d'une main d'un utilisateur, caractérisé en ce que les moyens de détection de la main comprennent un module interne (24), qui comporte le circuit de commande et qui est agencé du côté interne (16) du panneau de carrosserie (10), et un module externe (26), comportant au moins un boîtier (28) qui porte le capteur (14), et en ce que les modules externe (26) et interne (24) comportent des moyens de raccordement du capteur (14) au circuit de commande (20) qui viennent automatiquement en contact l'un avec l'autre lorsque les deux modules (24, 26) sont montés sur l'ouvrant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/718 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 85/10 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); H01R 12/7076 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2733783 A1 19961108 - KIEKERT AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972898 A1 20000119; EP 0972898 B1 20040414; DE 69916376 D1 20040519; DE 69916376 T2 20040909; FR 2781246 A1 20000121; FR 2781246 B1 20000818; US 6093978 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69916376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69916376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130709

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-10-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69916376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI