Global patent index - EP 0972900 A2

EP 0972900 A2 2000-01-19 - Espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Treibstangenverschluss

Title (fr)

Crémone-serrure

Publication

EP 0972900 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99109009 A

Priority

DE 19831671 A

Abstract (en)

A slider activated door lock has a spring loaded latch (5) which is pulled back by a slider (18) operated by the lock and by a retracting lever (36) which is operated by the door operating handle. The retracting lever has a pivot axis (35) behind that (10) of the door handle. The retracting lever is mounted in an extension to the top of the lock housing and has an extension arm (39) contacted by a cam (9) on the door handle mounting.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Treibstangenverschluß mit einer durch Drückerbetätigung zurückziehbaren Falle (5) und mit durch Schließzylinderbetätigung verlagerbarem Riegel (18) und Treibstangenanschlußschieber (31) und mit einem durch Drückerbetätigung schwenkbaren, auf den Treibstangenanschlußschieber (31) wirkenden, winkelförmigen Rückzugshebel (36) zum Rückzug des Treibstangenanschlußschiebers (31) und des Riegels (18). Zwecks Realisierung besonders geringer Dornmaße schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß die Schwenkachse (35) des Rückzugshebels (36) rückwärtig der Drückernuß (10) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00; E05B 59/00; E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 65/1086 (2013.01); E05B 63/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0834633 A1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972900 A2 20000119; EP 0972900 A3 20040102; EP 0972900 B1 20110629; AT 514829 T 20110715; DE 19831671 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150507

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150507

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 59915281

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120330

2011-10-05 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2011-08-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 59915281

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2011-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-05-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FUHR GMBH & CO. KG

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 59/00 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/00 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/02 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI