Global patent index - EP 0972902 A1

EP 0972902 A1 2000-01-19 - Door closer with reduced dimensions

Title (en)

Door closer with reduced dimensions

Title (de)

Türschliesser mit kompakten Abmessungen

Title (fr)

Ferme-porte à dimensions réduites

Publication

EP 0972902 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105904 A

Priority

DE 19831393 A

Abstract (en)

A compact door closing spring has a mechanical spring (3) which is linked to the door pivot (1) by a flexible drive (6), e.g. a chain drive. A hydraulic damper (13) is fitted separate from the spring and is also linked to the flexible drive. The enables the whole system to be fitted into a compact, slim housing with only the hydraulic section having to have a reinforced wall. A compact layout has the hydraulic damper and the spring on opposite sides of the pivot axis and linked by the flexible drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Türschließer mit einem Energiespeicher, der eine Schließerfeder 3 enthält, mit einer von der Schließerfeder 3 antreibbaren Schließerwelle 1 sowie mit einer hydraulischen fluidgedämpften Dämpfungsvorrichtung 12,13, wobei der Energiespeicher und die Dämpfungsvorrichtung 12,13 auf eine gemeinsame Schließerwelle 1 wirken, wobei die Schließerfeder 3 und die Schließerwelle 1 nicht mit dem Fluid der Dämpfungsvorrichtung 12,13 in Kontakt stehen. Hierdurch wird ein besonders schlankes Gehäuse ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/10 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/106 (2013.01); E05F 1/105 (2013.01); E05F 3/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/656 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); Y10S 16/09 (2013.01); Y10S 16/17 (2013.01); Y10S 16/21 (2013.01); Y10T 16/276 (2013.01); Y10T 16/2769 (2013.01); Y10T 16/2782 (2013.01); Y10T 16/2788 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972902 A1 20000119; EP 0972902 B1 20040728; DE 19831393 A1 20000120; US 6434788 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-10-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FI FR GB IT LI SE

2004-07-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI