Global patent index - EP 0972911 A1

EP 0972911 A1 2000-01-19 - Circuit for heating of water

Title (en)

Circuit for heating of water

Title (de)

Schaltung zur Aufwärmung von Wasser

Title (fr)

Circuit de chauffage de l'eau

Publication

EP 0972911 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810669 A

Priority

EP 98810669 A

Abstract (en)

A heating system for a steam turbine set has the recycled water, from the condenser (2) pumped through a set of low pressure preheaters to be heated by steam tapped from the low pressure turbine and with a water reservoir (7) between the high and low pressure stages, which also degasses the water. The water is then heated in a number of high pressure preheating stages, using steam tapped from the middle and high pressure stages of the turbine before being passed into the boiler (1).

Abstract (de)

Eine Schaltung (3) zur Vorwärmung von Speisewasser in einer Dampfkraftanlage mit mehreren Oberflächenvorwärmern und einem Niederdruck-Mischvorwärmer weist einen Hochdruckenthitzer (9) auf zur Enthitzung von Anzapfdampf für den Niederdruck-Mischvorwärmer (7). Der Hochdruckenthitzer (9) ist wasserseitig zwischen dem Speisewasserbehälter (7) und dem ersten Hochdruckenthitzer (10) geschaltet. Mittels dem überhitzten Anzapfdampf wird im Hochdruckenthitzer (9) eine Erwärmung des Speisewassers für den Mischvorwärmer um ca. 4 K erreicht. Dadurch ist der Wärmeverbrauch des nachgeschalteten Hochdruckvorwärmers (10) sowie auch der Wärmeverbrauch der gesamten Anlage geringer. Da die Temperatur des Speisewassers am Enthitzereintritt durch die Speisewasserpumpe etwa 3 K über der Sättigungstemperatur des Anzapfdampfes liegt, besteht im Enthitzer (9) keine Kondensationsgefahr und die Überhitzung des Anzapfdampfes kann voll ausgenützt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972911 A1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI