Global Patent Index - EP 0972936 A3

EP 0972936 A3 2000-07-19 - Positive displacement pumps

Title (en)

Positive displacement pumps

Title (de)

Verdrängerpumpen

Title (fr)

Pompes volumétriques

Publication

EP 0972936 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305492 A

Priority

GB 9815272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972936A2] A high pressure positive displacement pump, for example suitable for delivering fuel to a fuel injection system comprises one or more pumping assemblies (2,3,4). Each pumping assembly comprises a cylinder block (11) which defines a pumping cylinder (12) in which a pumping plunger (13) is slidably mounted. Each pumping plunger is connected to a tappet assembly (20) which comprises a tappet shell (21) slidably mounted in a bore (22). In use, the tappet assemblies engage a cam (6) to drive the pumping plungers in the pumping direction. A working fluid chamber (30) is defined on the side of each tappet assembly (20) opposite to the cam (6). In use, pressurised working fluid is delivered to the working fluid chamber (30) to drive the tappet and pumping plunger in the return direction. The arrangement obviates the need to provide a return spring for the pumping plungers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F02M 59/10; F04B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/043 (2013.01); F04B 9/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972936 A2 20000119; EP 0972936 A3 20000719; GB 9815272 D0 19980909; JP 2000038971 A 20000208; KR 20000016935 A 20000325

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 1/04 A, 7F 02M 59/10 B, 7F 04B 9/04 B

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI