Global patent index - EP 0972938 A2

EP 0972938 A2 2000-01-19 - Gas ballast device for a multistage positive displacement pump

Title (en)

Gas ballast device for a multistage positive displacement pump

Title (de)

Gasballasteinrichtung für eine mehrstufige Verdrängerpumpe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ballast de gaz pour une pompe volumétrique à plusieurs étages

Publication

EP 0972938 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112217 A

Priority

DE 19831123 A

Abstract (en)

A gas ballast system for multistage vacuum pumps, e.g. for piston pumps and membrane pumps, has flow restrictions (10) to bleed gas into the connecting duct (5) between the pump stages and with another flow restriction (10') to bleed gas into the displacement chamber (8) of the first stage. The control of the gas ballast uses simple components and is simple to adjust.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt eine Gasballasteinrichtung für mehrstufige Verdrängerpumpen wie z.B. Membranpumpen, Hubkolbenpumpen und dergleichen. Der Gasballast wird dabei zunächst über eine erste Anordnung (6) mit einer Drosselstelle (9) in den Zwischenvakuumraum eingelassen und dann über eine zweite Anordnung (7) mit einer Drosselstelle (10) in den Schöpfraum (8) der ersten Pumpstufe (1) weitergeleitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 45/033; F04B 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04B 25/00 (2006.01); F04B 37/14 (2006.01); F04B 37/16 (2006.01); F04B 37/20 (2006.01); F04B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 25/005 (2013.01); F04B 37/14 (2013.01); F04B 37/20 (2013.01); F04B 2205/061 (2013.01); F04C 2220/50 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831123 A1 20000113; AT 261063 T 20040315; EP 0972938 A2 20000119; EP 0972938 A3 20000628; EP 0972938 B1 20040303; JP 2000038986 A 20000208; JP 4159183 B2 20081001; US 6071085 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080610

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AM 12.05.2006 GESTUETZT AUF DAS AM 20.12.2005 EINGEREICHTE WIEDEREINSETZUNGSGESUCH AUF GRUND VON ART. 47 PATG WIEDER IN KRAFT GESETZT W

2006-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PFEIFFER VACUUM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59908691

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040408

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 45/033 A, 7F 04B 37/14 B, 7F 04B 25/00 B, 7F 04B 37/20 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI