Global Patent Index - EP 0972939 A2

EP 0972939 A2 2000-01-19 - Power control for multiple hydropumps

Title (en)

Power control for multiple hydropumps

Title (de)

Leistungsregelvorrichtung für mehrere Hydropumpen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de puissance pour plusieurs pompes hydrauliques

Publication

EP 0972939 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113343 A

Priority

DE 19831587 A

Abstract (en)

A control circuit for one or more hydraulic pumps has a hydraulic servo (6) which regulates the setting of the hydraulic pumps in response to the output of the system. A control loop (10,11) parallel to the main output line (3) has variable control valves and a variable flow restriction (12) which dumps fluid back into the sump. With increasing pressure in the control loop the hydraulic response is to increase the pump setting.

Abstract (de)

Eine Leistungsregelvorrichtung (1) dient zur Regelung der hydraulischen Leistung einer in eine Arbeitsleitung (3) fördernden Hydropumpe (2), deren Schwenkwinkel mittels einer Verstellvorrichtung (6) verstellbar ist. Mit der Arbeitsleitung (3) ist eine Stromregeleinrichtung (11) verbunden, die einem Nebenkreis (10) einen konstanten Volumenstrom zuführt. Ferner ist in dem Nebenkreis (10) eine Ablaufdrossel (12) vorgesehen, deren Drosselquerschnitt von dem Schwenkwinkel der Hydropumpe (2) abhängig ist. Ein Steuerventil (17) beaufschlagt mit zunehmendem Nebendruck in dem Nebenkreis (10) zwischen der Stromregeleinrichtung (11) und der Ablaufdrossel (12) die Verstellvorrichtung (6) in Richtung auf einen vergrößerten Schwenkwinkel der Hydropumpe (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08; F04B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/002 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F04B 2201/12051 (2013.01); F04B 2205/061 (2013.01); F04B 2205/16 (2013.01); F04B 2205/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972939 A2 20000119; EP 0972939 A3 20000823; EP 0972939 B1 20060830; DE 19831587 A1 20000224; DE 19831587 C2 20000615; DE 59913812 D1 20061012

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100709

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913812 P 20061012

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/08 A, 7F 04B 49/00 B, 7F 04B 1/32 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI