Global Patent Index - EP 0972940 A2

EP 0972940 A2 2000-01-19 - Power control unit to control the hydraulic power in a drive line

Title (en)

Power control unit to control the hydraulic power in a drive line

Title (de)

Leistungsregelvorrichtung zur Regelung der hydraulischen Leistung in einer Arbeitsleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de puissance pour la régulation de la puissance hydraulique dans un circuit de travail

Publication

EP 0972940 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113344 A

Priority

DE 19831586 A

Abstract (en)

A control circuit for a hydraulic system has the control via a secondary circuit which takes only a fraction of the main flow and which has a direct control on the main flow control valve (5). The control loop is fed with a constant volume from the input (3) f the control system and dumps the fluid into the sump via a variable throughput flow dump valve (12). The pressure in the control loop has a direct effect on the back of the main flow control valve to maintain the required flow, by increasing the valve setting with increasing pressure in the control loop.

Abstract (de)

Die Leistungsregelvorrichtung (1) dient zur Regelung der hydraulischen Leistung in einer Arbeitsleitung (2). Zwischen einem Eingang (3) und einem Ausgang (4) ist in der Arbeitsleitung (2) ein Hauptventil (5) angeordnete, das einen Ventilkörper (6) aufweist, der abhängig von seiner Lage die Arbeitsleitung (2) freigibt oder drosselt. Mit dem Eingang (3) ist eine Stromregeleinrichtung (8) verbunden, die einem Nebenkreis (7) einem konstanten Volumenstrom zuführt. In dem Nebenkreis (7) ist eine Ablaufdrossel (12) angeordnet, deren Drosselquerschnitt von der Lage des Ventilkolbens (6) des Hauptventils (5) abhängt. Eine an den Ventilkörper (6) des Hauptventils (5) angrenzende erste Ventilkammer ist in dem Nebenkreis (7) zwischen der Stromregeleinrichtung (8) und der Ablaufdrossel (12) angeordnet. Diese Ventilkammer (13) beaufschlagt den Ventilkörper (6) mit zunehmendem Druck in dem Nebenkreis (7) in Richtung auf einen zunehmenden Öffnungsquerschnitt des Hauptventils (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08; F04B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/002 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F04B 2205/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972940 A2 20000119; EP 0972940 A3 20000927; EP 0972940 B1 20060830; DE 19831586 A1 20000203; DE 19831586 C2 20000518; DE 59913813 D1 20061012

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913813 P 20061012

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI