Global Patent Index - EP 0972947 A2

EP 0972947 A2 2000-01-19 - Brush boom system of a tunnel washing vehicle

Title (en)

Brush boom system of a tunnel washing vehicle

Title (de)

Bürstenauslegervorrichtung eines Tunnelwaschfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Système de bras à brosses d'un véhicule de lavage de tunnels

Publication

EP 0972947 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890156 A

Priority

  • AT 47198 U
  • AT 24199 U

Abstract (en)

A brush support arm for a tunnel cleaning vehicle holds the rotating brush against the tunnel wall and is retracted partially whenever obstructions are met eg. traffic signs, blowers etc. The main servo drive for the arm comprises a pneumatic ram (9) with a pneumatic ram (10) in series. The cylinders of the two rams are linked. The major movement of the arm is controlled by the hydraulic ram while the pneumatic ram covers the smaller deflections of the brush as well as controlling the brushing pressure

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Antriebseinrichtung (7) zur Schwenkeinstellung eines Bürstenauslegers (3, 4) eines Tunnelwaschfahrzeuges (1, 2) ist für eine hydraulisch betätigbare Zylinder-Kolbeneinheit (9) eine Verlängerung aus einer pneumatisch betätigbaren Zylinder-Kolbeneinheit (10) vorgesehen, über die der Bürstenanpreßdruck genau eingestellt werden kann und die ein rasches Ausweichen an Hindernissen ermöglicht. Eine einfache Reglerausbildungist angegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/072; E01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/072 (2006.01); F15B 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/072 (2013.01); E01H 1/005 (2013.01); F15B 11/125 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3111 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6336 (2013.01); F15B 2211/665 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/765 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972947 A2 20000119; EP 0972947 A3 20020417; EP 0972947 B1 20040818; DE 59910253 D1 20040923

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 274143 T

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910253

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910253

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZELLINGER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Free text: ZELLINGER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.#KREMSTALSTRASSE 102#A-4050 TRAUN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ZELLINGER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.#KREMSTALSTRASSE 102#A-4050 TRAUN (AT)

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910253 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI LU

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BRUSH BOOM SYSTEM OF A TUNNEL WASHING VEHICLE

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI LU

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 15B 11/072 A, 7E 01H 1/00 B, 7F 15B 11/13 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI LU

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI