Global patent index - EP 0972951 A2

EP 0972951 A2 2000-01-19 - Setting device having nail magazine

Title (en)

Setting device having nail magazine

Title (de)

Setzgerät mit Nagelmagazin

Title (fr)

Outil de pose avec magasin de clous

Publication

EP 0972951 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810586 A

Priority

DE 19831060 A

Abstract (en)

The nails (6) are guided by a pushing element (2) inside a U-shaped rail (1) to a downwards pointing duct (5) with an outlet. A swivel mounted locking element (3,9), which prevents the nails (6) from reversing or jamming when swung into the locking position, acts in combination with two guides (12,13) positioned parallel to each side of the shafts (11) of the transported items (6) and extends into the outlet area (5,16).

Abstract (de)

Das Setzgerät weist eine Transportvorrichtung (4) für nagelförmige Befestigungselemente (6) mit einer im wesentlichen senkrecht von einem Führungsrohr (16) abragenden Führungsschiene (1), einem entlang der Führungsschiene (1) gegen die Kraft einer Feder (7) versetzbaren Schieber (2) und einem Verriegelungselement (3) auf. Mittels eines Führungsbereiches (9) des Verriegelungselementes (3), der durch eine Durchtrittsöffnung (10) in einer parallel zur Setzrichtung erstreckenden Seite der Führungsschiene (1) hindurch in die lichte Weite des Führungskanals (5) in eine Verriegelungsstellung versetzbar ist, wird die Versetzbarkeit von in dem Führungskanal (5) anordbaren Befestigungselementen (6) entgegen der Setzrichtung begrenzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 19/14; B25C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 7/13 (2006.01); B25C 1/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/184 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972951 A2 20000119; EP 0972951 A3 20010926; EP 0972951 B1 20060906; AU 3910499 A 20000203; AU 746962 B2 20020509; CN 1106908 C 20030430; CN 1245105 A 20000223; DE 19831060 A1 20000120; DE 59913829 D1 20061019; JP 2000052271 A 20000222; JP 4402768 B2 20100120; PL 188513 B1 20050228; US 6237747 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59913829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20061019

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 16B 19/14 A, 7B 25C 1/00 B, 7B 25C 1/18 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI