Global Patent Index - EP 0972984 A2

EP 0972984 A2 2000-01-19 - Vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Fahrzeugscheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Phare

Publication

EP 0972984 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112685 A

Priority

DE 19831852 A

Abstract (en)

The automobile headlamp has a rear reflector (2) with a central opening for locating the light bulb (3) which is screened by a screening plate (5) having at least 2 support arms cooperating with the edge of the reflector opening. The screening plate has a retaining spring which is stressed in the transverse direction and which has spring arms extending in the longitudinal direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einem Reflektor (2), dem in Abstrahlrichtung eine eine Glühlampe (3) abschirmende Strahlenblende (5) vorgelagert ist, wobei die Strahlenblende (5) mindestens zwei Tragarme (8) aufweist zur Verbindung der Strahlenblende (5) mit einem Reflektorhals (14) des Reflektors, wobei der Strahlenblende (5) eine Haltefeder (15) zugeordnet ist mit in Querrichtung unter Vorspannung stehenden und sich in Längsrichtung erstreckenden Federarmen (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/14; F21V 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/145 (2013.01); F21S 48/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972984 A2 20000119; EP 0972984 A3 20020130; DE 19831852 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051022

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI