Global patent index - EP 0972985 A2

EP 0972985 A2 2000-01-19 - Lamp housing for embedment in a concrete construction element, in particular in a concrete ceiling

Title (en)

Lamp housing for embedment in a concrete construction element, in particular in a concrete ceiling

Title (de)

Leuchtengehäuse für den Einbau in ein Betonbauteil, insbesondere in eine Betondecke

Title (fr)

Boîtier de lampe à noyer dans un élément en béton, notamment dans un plafond en béton

Publication

EP 0972985 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99108885 A

Priority

DE 19832252 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp housing (10 receives at least one recessed light, e.g. a downlight and its operating device, e.g. a transformer, the opening (14) for insertion of the recessed light provided with a closure element (15) secured to a shuttering element (17) for the concrete component. A releasable direct fixing is provided between the lamp housing and the closure element.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben ist ein Leuchtengehäuse (10) für den Einbau in ein Betonbauteil, insbesondere in eine Betondecke (29), zur Aufnahme von wenigstens einer Einbauleuchte, wie Downlight od. dgl., sowie von gegebenenfalls der Einbauleuchte zugeordneten Betriebsgeräten, z.B. von einem Transformator, mit einem eine Einstecköffnung (14) für die Einbauleuchte verschließenden, an einer Verschalung (17) für das Betonbauteil anliegenden Verschlußelement (15). Die Besonderheit des Leuchtengehäuses besteht darin, daß das Leuchtengehäuse (10) und das Verschlußelement (15) lösbar direkt aneinander befestigt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04; E04B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 15/06 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 15/061 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972985 A2 20000119; EP 0972985 A3 20000412; DE 19832252 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061231

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 21/04 A, 7E 04B 9/00 B, 7H 02G 3/20 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI