Global Patent Index - EP 0972985 A3

EP 0972985 A3 2000-04-12 - Lamp housing for embedment in a concrete construction element, in particular in a concrete ceiling

Title (en)

Lamp housing for embedment in a concrete construction element, in particular in a concrete ceiling

Title (de)

Leuchtengehäuse für den Einbau in ein Betonbauteil, insbesondere in eine Betondecke

Title (fr)

Boîtier de lampe à noyer dans un élément en béton, notamment dans un plafond en béton

Publication

EP 0972985 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108885 A

Priority

DE 19832252 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972985A2] The lamp housing (10 receives at least one recessed light, e.g. a downlight and its operating device, e.g. a transformer, the opening (14) for insertion of the recessed light provided with a closure element (15) secured to a shuttering element (17) for the concrete component. A releasable direct fixing is provided between the lamp housing and the closure element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04; E04B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 15/06 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 15/061 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972985 A2 20000119; EP 0972985 A3 20000412; DE 19832252 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061231

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 21/04 A, 7E 04B 9/00 B, 7H 02G 3/20 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI