Global Patent Index - EP 0972986 A2

EP 0972986 A2 2000-01-19 - Method for avoiding thermoacoustice flame and pressure vibrations in a furnace

Title (en)

Method for avoiding thermoacoustice flame and pressure vibrations in a furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vermeidung von thermoakustischen Flammen- bzw. Druckschwingungen bei Feuerungen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour eviter des vibrations pour flamme et par pression dans un four

Publication

EP 0972986 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112485 A

Priority

DE 19831933 A

Abstract (en)

The method is for use in heating systems where the flame holder separates the air/mix chamber(1) from the combustion chamber(2). A throttle is arranged in the air chamber upstream of the flame holder(3) to increase the acoustic damping and to decouple the combustion chamber from the mixing chamber. The throttle(5) has a variable cross section. The throttle opening is varied in dependence on the air/mixture flow volume such that the pressure gradient (dy/dx) of the throttle with increasing flow volume is always smaller than that of a throttle with constant cross section according to the relationship dy/dx is less than 2 const x. An Independent claim is also included for a burner operated according to the method. The throttle is varied through the use of an external control using an actuator.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Vermeidung von thermoakustischen Flammen- bzw. Druckschwingungen bei Feuerungen, die mit einem gebläseunterstützten, vorzugsweise modulierenden Brenner betrieben werden, dessen Flammenhalter (3) den Luft/Gemischraum (1) vom Verbrennungsraum (2) trennt, wobei im Luft/Gemischraum (1) stromauf des Flammenhalters (3) zur Verstärkung der akustischen Dämpfung und zur schwingungsmäßigen Abkopplung des Verbrennungsraumes (2) vom Gemischraum (1) eine Drossel (5) angeordnet ist. Nach der Erfindung wird eine im Drosselquerschnitt (5') variable Drossel (5) verwendet und deren Drosselwirkung in Abhängigkeit vom geförderten Luft/Gemisch-Volumenstrom derart variiert, daß der Druckgradient (dy/dx) der Drossel (5) mit zunehmenden Volumenstrom stets kleiner ist als der einer Drossel mit unveränderlichem Drosselquerschnitt (5') gemäß der Beziehung: (dy/dx) < 2 const x. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/34 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F23D 14/60 (2006.01); F23D 14/64 (2006.01); F23D 14/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/60 (2013.01); F23D 14/34 (2013.01); F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23D 14/64 (2013.01); F23D 14/74 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972986 A2 20000119; EP 0972986 A3 20000531; DE 19831933 C1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23D 14/34 A, 7F 23D 14/64 B, 7F 23D 14/46 B, 7F 23D 14/60 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI