Global patent index - EP 0972988 A1

EP 0972988 A1 2000-01-19 - Method and apparatus for extracting water from combustion residues mechanically discharged from a wet slag remover

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for extracting water from combustion residues mechanically discharged from a wet slag remover

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entziehen von Wasser aus mechanisch aus einem Nassentschlacker ausgetragenen Verbrennungsrückständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour enlever l'eau des résidus de combustion évacués mécaniquement d'un dispositif d'enlèvement du laitier par voie humide

Publication

EP 0972988 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111009 A

Priority

CH 150298 A

Abstract (en)

The method for processing ash and clinker from a furnace involves dropping the hot clinker into a water bath (14) from where it is extracted by a moving grid conveyor. A negative pressure is applied to the underside of the grid to remove water and vapor, with the water recycled back to the bath. The water bath is thermally insulated to retain heat and ensure that the wet clinker is between 70 and 80 degrees C for maximum drying efficiency. The grid drops the dried clinker into a bin and is cleaned by air jets.

Abstract (de)

Die über einen Schlackeschacht (18) in einen Nassentschlacker (12) gelangten Verbrennungsrückstände werden durch eine mechanisches Fördermittel (20) aus dem in einer Wanne (14) des Nassentschlackers (12) befindlichen Wasserbad (16) ausgetragen. Der Wärmeverlust der Verbrennungsrückstände wird dabei durch eine Wärmeisolation (15) an den Wänden der Wanne (14) des Nassentschlackers (12) und durch wärmeisolierende Schwimmkörper (17) auf dem Wasserbad (16) minimiert. Im Endbereich (25) einer Austragstrecke (26) werden die Verbrennungsrückstände von dem mechanischen Fördermittel (20) auf einen Filterrost (32) einer Unterdruckvorrichtung (34) gefördert. Dort wird ihnen aufgrund eines am Filterrost (32) anliegenden Unterdrucks aus dem Nassentschlacker (12) mitausgetragenes Wasser entzogen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 1/02; F26B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09B 5/00 (2006.01); C22B 1/00 (2006.01); F23J 1/02 (2006.01); F26B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 17/04 (2013.01); F23J 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4989346 A 19910205 - WILKEN LESLIE E [US]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 246 (M - 176) 4 December 1982 (1982-12-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972988 A1 20000119; EP 0972988 B1 20030212; CH 692773 A5 20021031; DE 59904259 D1 20030320; JP 2000081208 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904259

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2003-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MORANT, DANIEL

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIRZ, CHRISTIAN

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRUNNER, MARTIN

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FREY, RUEDI

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011126

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991016

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI