Global patent index - EP 0972990 A1

EP 0972990 A1 2000-01-19 - Burner system for near stochiometric combustion of liquid or gaseous fuel

Title (en)

Burner system for near stochiometric combustion of liquid or gaseous fuel

Title (de)

Brennersystem zur nahstöchiometrischen Verbrennung von flüssigem oder gasförmigen Brennstoff

Title (fr)

Brûleur à combustion quasi stochiométrique de combustible liquide ou gazeux

Publication

EP 0972990 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113915 A

Priority

DE 19832132 A

Abstract (en)

The burner system, for liquid or gas fuel, has a burner with an atomiser jet and a support tube round it. It also has a combustion chamber consisting of a flame tube projecting into a boiler cavity and a mixing system with an open recirculation cross section. The combustion air is drawn in by a radial fan (24,30-33,40,41) operating in two stages, one through a first induction cavity (81) acting radially and one through a second induction cavity as a cross-flow blower. The second induction cavity is sealed off from the first one.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Blaubrennersystem mit äußerer Rezirkulation in der Startphase eine Störung des Brennstoff/Luft-Verhältnisses zu minimieren und eine daraus resultierende NOx-Bildung unterdrücken zu können, ohne dazu den Rezirkulationsquerschnitt (15) schließen zu müssen oder sonstige Beinflußung der äußeren Rezirkulation vornehmen zu müssen, ist als Einrichtung zur Zufuhr von Verbrennungsluft ein Radialgebläse vorgesehen, das als zweistufiges Gebläse arbeitet, mit einer ersten durch einen ersten Saugraum (81) gebildeten, als Radialgebläse arbeitenden Stufe und einer zweiten durch einen zweiten Saugraum (80) gebildeten als Querstromgebläse arbeitenden Stufe, wobei der zweite Saugraum (80) gegen den ersten den ersten Saugraum (81) weitestgehend abgedichtet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 5/02; F04D 17/04; F04D 25/16; F04D 29/42; F23D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23D 11/001 (2013.01); F23C 2900/09002 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11403 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972990 A1 20000119; EP 0972990 B1 20030521; AT 241112 T 20030615; DE 19832132 C1 19991216

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100716

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: MHG HEIZTECHNIK GMBH

- Free Format Text: MHG HEIZTECHNIK GMBH#ROSSWEG 6#20457 HAMBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MHG HEIZTECHNIK GMBH#ROSSWEG 6#20457 HAMBURG (DE)

2007-05-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-05-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-12-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: MHG HEIZTECHNIK GMBH

- Free Format Text: MAN B & W DIESEL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STADTBACHSTRASSE 1#86153 AUGSBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MHG HEIZTECHNIK GMBH#ROSSWEG 6#20457 HAMBURG (DE)

2005-07-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2004-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 06

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH, WETZLARTE-PATENTWESEN

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59905617

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030626

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI