Global patent index - EP 0973000 A3

EP 0973000 A3 2001-03-14 - Shelves for supporting goods, especially in refrigerators and supports forming these shelves

Title (en)

Shelves for supporting goods, especially in refrigerators and supports forming these shelves

Title (de)

Warenträgerregale, insbesondere in Kühlschränken und diese Regale bildende Untergestelle

Title (fr)

Etagères destinées à supporter des articles, notamment dans les réfrigérateurs et supports constituant ces étagères

Publication

EP 0973000 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99401780 A

Priority

  • IT UD980128 A
  • US 18550098 A
  • US 18752798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0973000A2] The shelf (10) is formed from a panel (11) supported by a support member (12). The panel includes a channel (13) that runs around the perimeter for the collection of liquids. The shelf is supported by beams (15) that have fixings in the shape of grooved notches (18) that locate on the back wall. A spring loaded clip (21) locks the upper notch in place. An Independent claim is included for a shelf unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 57/42; A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/42 (2006.01); F25D 21/14 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01); F25D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2013.01); A47B 57/42 (2013.01); F25D 21/14 (2013.01); F25D 27/00 (2013.01); F25D 2325/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973000 A2 20000119; EP 0973000 A3 20010314; BR 9902828 A 20000215; JP 2000258050 A 20000922; MX PA99006563 A 20110428

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041127

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021205

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990727

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990727

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 25D 25/02 A, 7A 47B 96/06 B, 7A 47B 57/42 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990727