Global patent index - EP 0973004 A2

EP 0973004 A2 2000-01-19 - Pistol with trigger safety lock

Title (en)

Pistol with trigger safety lock

Title (de)

Pistole mit Abzugssperrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Pistolet comportant un verrou de sécurité pour la détente

Publication

EP 0973004 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890226 A

Priority

AT 47898 U

Abstract (en)

A safety catch for an automatic piston has a locking bolt (11) in a transverse bore and held in the released position by a coil spring (15) around the bolt. The head (13) of the bolt is depressed and locked by simple twist action to lock the bayonet catch. In this position the bolt blocks the action of the trigger release. The catch is released by twisting the bayonet catch in the opposite direction and letting the spring push out the catch.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pistole besteht aus einem einen Abzugsmechanismus enthaltenden Griffstück (1,2) und einem in Längsrichtung verschiebbaren Laufschlitten (5), wobei im oberen Teil des Griffstückes ein Züngel (3) gelührt ist. Um ein schnelles, einfaches und doch zuverlässiges Zusperren und Aufsperren zu ermöglichen, ist in einer seitlichen Querbohrung (12) des Griffstückes (1,2) ein Sperrbolzen (11;36) verschiebbar und verdrehbar geführt, der in gesperrtem Zustand in die Bahn des Züngels (3) ragt, wobei am Sperrbolzen (11;36) eine Druckfeder (15) in Öffnungsrichtung angreift und der Sperrbolzen einen Kopf(13) aufweist, der bajonettartig mit ciner Bohrung (14) in einer Seitenwand (9) des Griffstükkes (1) zusammenwirkt, sodaß zwei verschiedenen Winkelstellungen des Sperrbolzens (11;36) zwei Hubstellungen desselben entsprechen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/04 (2006.01); F41A 17/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/46 (2013.01); F41A 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973004 A2 20000119; EP 0973004 A3 20010321; EP 0973004 B1 20050112; AT 287075 T 20050115; AT 3147 U1 19991025; DE 59911427 D1 20050217; ES 2235455 T3 20050701; US 6212812 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-01-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59911427

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, WIENER NEUSTADT, AT

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911427

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOENIG SZYNKA TILMANN VON RENESSE PATENTANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911427

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOENIG, SZYNKA, TILMANN, VON RENESSE PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20131121

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235455

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911427

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050217

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

2003-02-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 41A 17/46 A, 7F 41A 11/00 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI