Global Patent Index - EP 0973005 A2

EP 0973005 A2 2000-01-19 - Pistol with precocked percussion pin

Title (en)

Pistol with precocked percussion pin

Title (de)

Pistole mit vorgespanntem Schlagbolzen

Title (fr)

Pistolet comportant un percuteur préarmé

Publication

EP 0973005 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890171 A

Priority

AT 47998 U

Abstract (en)

A piston with a tensioned bolt action has the bolt held back by a retainer (20). The bolt spring (8) is tensioned either by pulling back the slide or by the recoil of the previous round. The trigger release pushes back the retainer with a sliding action, backed by a second spring. The front of the retainer slides over a fixed support (35) for the initial part of the slide action, followed by a tilt action caused by a sloping part (37) of the retainer. This allows the retainer to be depressed by the force of the bolt spring and release the bolt. The retainer is reset to hold the bolt after the recoil action.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pistole besteht aus einem Gehäuse und einem auf diesem gleitenden, den Lauf(3) und den Verschluß (4) enthaltenden Schlitten (2), wobei der Verschluß (4) eine Schlagfeder (8) und einen Schlagbolzen (7) besitzt und ein Züngel (13) über eine Abzugsstange (15) auf die Abzugseinrichtung (5) wirkt. Um mit einer möglichst einfachen Konstruktion eine entscheidende Verbesserung der Abzugscharakteristik zu erreichen, ist: a) das Fangstück (20) in Längsrichtung verschiebbar und abwärts verschwenkbar im Gehäuse (1) geführt und von einer ersten Feder (30) aufwärts beaufschlagt, b) eine gehäusefeste Schwelle (35) vorgesehen, die mit einer Rampe (37) des Fangstükkes (20) zusammenwirkt, sodaß beim Abziehen das Fangstück zuerst in Längsrichtung verschoben wird und nach Überschreiten der Schwelle abwärts schwenkt, c) vor dem Fangstück (20) ein um eine gehäusefeste Achse schwenkbarer Schlepphebel (40) vorgesehen, der von einer zweiten Feder (43) nach hinten zum Fangstück hin belastet ist, im Abstand von seiner Achse (31) eine Scheitelkante (47) aufweist und sich in seiner vordersten Stellung an der Wand (46) des Gehäuses abstützt, d) das Fangstück (20) vorne mit einem Näschen (32) versehen, das auf der Scheitelkante (47) des Schlepphebels (40) aufliegt, wenn sich Fangstück und Schlepphebel in einer hinteren Stellung befinden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/46 (2006.01); F41A 19/16 (2006.01); F41A 19/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/46 (2013.01); F41A 19/16 (2013.01); F41A 19/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973005 A2 20000119; EP 0973005 A3 20010307; EP 0973005 B1 20031119; AT 3024 U1 19990825; DE 59907777 D1 20031224; US 6263606 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907777

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59907777

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2004-11-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907777

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2003-11-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-02-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI