Global Patent Index - EP 0973006 A2

EP 0973006 A2 2000-01-19 - Projectile with controlled destruction, the projectile having a second active charge which is embedded in a first active charge

Title (en)

Projectile with controlled destruction, the projectile having a second active charge which is embedded in a first active charge

Title (de)

Wurfkörper mit kontrollierter Zerlegung und in den Wirkmassenbereich integrierter Ladung

Title (fr)

Projectile à destruction contrôlée comportant une deuxième charge intégrée dans une première charge utile

Publication

EP 0973006 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112702 A

Priority

DE 29812623 U

Abstract (en)

Projectile has a working charge, in particular, one consisting of a rapidly burning deception component (3) producing an instantaneous fog, and a slowly burning camouflaging component (2) producing a long-term fog. In addition, it has a detonator, an ejector charge and/or a detonator and decomposer charge, and at least one detonation delay element. At least one component (3) of the working charge is only radially decomposable. The bottom (1b) of at least one working charge tin (16) is firmly joined to the lid (16a) of this tin, even during decomposition of the component (3). The ejector charge (22) and/or the detonator and decomposer charge (32), as well as at least one detonation delay element (21, 31) are integrated into the working charge (2, 3). The detonator (20) is at least partially integrated into the component (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wurfkörper mit einer Wirkmasse, insbesondere einer rasch brennenden, einen Spontannebel erzeugenden Täuschkomponente und einer langsam brennenden, einen Dauernebel erzeugenden Tarnkomponente, mit einem Anzünder, mit einer Ausstoßladung und/oder Anzündzerlegerladung und mit zumindest einem Anzündverzögerer, wobei die zumindest eine Wirkmassenkomponente ausschließlich radial zerlegbar ist, der Boden zumindest einer Wirkmassendose fest mit dem Deckel dieser Wirkmassendose verbunden ist, auch bei Zerlegung der Wirkmasse, und die Ausstoßladung und/oder Anzündzerlegerladung sowie der zumindest eine Anzündverzögerer sowie der Anzünder in die Wirkmasse eingebaut sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812623 U1 19981210; DE 59904310 D1 20030327; EP 0973006 A2 20000119; EP 0973006 A3 20010404; EP 0973006 B1 20030219; ES 2190155 T3 20030716; US 6283032 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904310

2015-08-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH, 79395 NEUENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59904310

2015-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904310

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904310

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH

- Free text: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH#HANS-BUCK-STRASSE 1#79395 NEUENBURG/BADEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH#HANS-BUCK-STRASSE 1#79395 NEUENBURG/BADEN (DE)

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190155 T3

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904310 P 20030327

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI