Global patent index - EP 0973071 A3

EP 0973071 A3 2000-07-05 - Method of using an image forming apparatus

Title (en)

Method of using an image forming apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verwendung eines Bilderzeugungsgerätes

Title (fr)

Méthode d'utilisation d'un appareil de formation d'images

Publication

EP 0973071 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304271 A

Priority

  • EP 99304271 A
  • EP 98305581 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0973071A2] A plurality of electrostatic images are formed on a moving tensioned belt (26) comprising an electrically conductive base (58) having a non-conductive image-carrying surface layer (59). The images are developed by passing the belt through a plurality of toner development stations, each of which includes a development unit (35, 36, 37, 38) including a magnetic roller (51) and a backing member (53), in opposed position to the magnetic roller (51), over which the belt (26) passes. Under non-ideal conditions (defined in the text), the image quality in terms of image density and uniformity of image density and rendition of sharp image transitions, is substantially improved by using an alternating electrical field between the magnetic roller (51) and the belt (26), the peak-to-peak voltage of which is greater than 800 volts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/01; G03G 15/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/754 (2013.01); G03G 15/0907 (2013.01); G03G 2215/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973071 A2 20000119; EP 0973071 A3 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050408

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON INTERNATIONAL N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 03G 15/00 A, 7G 03G 15/01 B, 7G 03G 15/09 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI