Global patent index - EP 0973076 A1

EP 0973076 A1 2000-01-19 - Watch with tourbillon

Title (en)

Watch with tourbillon

Title (de)

Uhr mit Tourbillon

Title (fr)

Montre à tourbillon

Publication

EP 0973076 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98113226 A

Priority

EP 98113226 A

Abstract (en)

Watch has a regulator (2) engaged with a release device (3) that connects to a pinion (65) that engages with a fixed wheel (5). The latter are mounted on a solid plate (6) with a tube (7) integral to the plate pivoted in a lock plate (8). The tube is situated at the center of the watch and entrained by a spring-loaded motor (9). The fixed wheel and pinion are engaged below the plate.

Abstract (fr)

La montre à tourbillon comporte un organe régulateur (2) en prise avec un échappement (3) lui-même en prise avec un rouage (4) s'engrenant avec une roue fixe (5). L'organe régulateur, l'échappement et le rouage sont montés sur un plateau (6) solidaire d'un tube (7) pivoté dans une platine (8, 46), ce tube étant situé au centre de la montre et entraîné en rotation par un organe moteur à ressort (9). La roue fixe (5) est située au-dessous du plateau (6). De préférence, le tube (7) entoure une chaussée (11) portant une aiguille des minutes (12), cette chaussée entourant à son tour un arbre (13) portant une aiguille des heures (14). L'arbre (13) et la chaussée (11) sont reliés par une minuterie (15) située au-dessous du plateau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 17/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/28 (2006.01); G04B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/285 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 33368 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973076 A1 20000119; EP 0973076 B1 20080213; DE 69839116 D1 20080327; DE 69839116 T2 20090205; HK 1024308 A1 20081224; JP 2000056040 A 20000225; JP 4360715 B2 20091111; US 6402368 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110716

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110716

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110716

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-12-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1024308

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2008-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69839116

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20080327

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060404

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI