Global patent index - EP 0973084 A2

EP 0973084 A2 2000-01-19 - Integrated circuit with a voltage regulator

Title (en)

Integrated circuit with a voltage regulator

Title (de)

Integrierte Schaltung mit einem Spannungsregler

Title (fr)

Circuit intégré avec un régulateur de tension

Publication

EP 0973084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113089 A

Priority

DE 19832309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832309C1] An integrated circuit includes a voltage regulator (O), which specifically includes an op.amp, and which generates an internal supply voltage (VInt), and which has an input for supplying an actual or measured value and an input for supplying a reference voltage as a desired value. The actual or measured value is generated by a first voltage divider (R3,R4) from the internal supply voltage (VInt), and a second voltage divider (R1,R2) is connected across the first, and has the same voltage-dividing ratio as the first voltage divider. The voltage regulator's sensitivity is set by the value of resistance of at least one resistance element (R3) of the first potential divider (R3,R4).

Abstract (de)

Die integrierte Schaltung weist einen Spannungsregler (OP) zum Erzeugen einer internen Versorgungsspannung (VInt) auf, der einen Eingang zum Zuführen eines Istwertes und einen Eingang zum Zuführen einer Referenzspannung (VRef) als Sollwert aufweist. Der Istwert wird mittels eines ersten Spannungsteilers (R3, R4) aus der internen Versorgungsspannung (VInt) erzeugt. Die Empfindlichkeit des Spannungsreglers (OP) hängt vom Widerstandswert wenigstens eines Widerstandselementes (R3) des ersten Spannungsteilers ab. Dem ersten Spannungsteiler (R3, R4) ist ein zweiter Spannungsteiler (R1, R2) parallel geschaltet, der das gleiche Spannungsteilerverhältnis wie der erste Spannungsteiler aufweist und der durch wenigstens ein Schaltelement (S1, S2) aktivierbar und deaktivierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/575

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/46 (2006.01); G05F 1/575 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/468 (2013.01); G05F 1/575 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 3105198 A1
  • [A] US 5467009 A
  • [A] EP 0846996 A1
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 106 (P-449), 22. April 1986 (1986-04-22) & JP 60 238915 A (IKEGAMI TSUUSHINKI KK), 27. November 1985 (1985-11-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 07, 31. März 1998 (1998-03-31) & JP 06 059413 A (EASTMAN KODAK CO), 4. März 1994 (1994-03-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832309 C1 19991014; DE 59915043 D1 20090806; EP 0973084 A2 20000119; EP 0973084 A3 20000405; EP 0973084 B1 20090624; TW M251161 U 20041121; US 6133779 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Effective date: 20160212

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59915043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100325

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-02-17 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2009-08-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: QIMONDA AG

2009-08-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59915043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20090806

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-07-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2009-06-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IE IT

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7G 05F 1/575 A, 7G 05F 1/46 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI