Global patent index - EP 0973142 A2

EP 0973142 A2 2000-01-19 - Device to show product and/or price information

Title (en)

Device to show product and/or price information

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage d'informations sur produits et/ou prix

Publication

EP 0973142 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99104719 A

Priority

DE 19822921 A

Abstract (en)

On the rear side of the view container strips are so arranged that they form individual view compartments for accommodating product and/or price information. A pivot axis of the view container (3) is defined by at least one first fixture component provided on at least one side surface (15) of the view container. The view container can be folded outwards by a pivot movement around a pivot axis out of the support housing. The fixture component is formed as a hinge, comprising a button or pin (9a) and a corresponding cavity (9b) in which the button or pin engages.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation (16), bestehend aus einem Trägergehäuse (2) und zumindest einem Sichtbehälter (3), wobei der Sichtbehälter (3) aus einer zumindest teilweise transparenten Vorderwand (6) besteht, an deren Rückseite (7) Leisten (5) derart angeordnet sind, daß sie einzelne Sichtfächer (4) für die Aufnahme von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformationen (16) bilden. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Anzeige von Produkt- und/oder Preisinformation (16) vorzuschlagen, die es erlaubt, die jeweiligen Produkt- und/oder Preisinformationen (16) einfach und sicher auszuwechseln. Die Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß eine Schwenkachse (8) des Sichtbehälters (3) durch zumindest ein erstes Befestigungselement (9a, 9b) definiert ist, das an zumindest einer Seitenfläche (15) des Sichtbehälters (3) vorgesehen ist, daß der Sichtbehälter durch eine Schwenkbewegung um eine Schwenkachse des Sichtbehälters aus dem Trägergehäuse herausklappbar ist und daß das Befestigungselement (9a, 9b) derart ausgebildet ist, daß es die Schwenkbewegung des Sichtbehälters (3) aus dem Trägergehäuse (2) heraus auf einen vorbestimmten Winkelbereich einschränkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822921 A1 19991202; AT 249083 T 20030915; EP 0973142 A2 20000119; EP 0973142 A3 20001025; EP 0973142 B1 20030903

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-12-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906830

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

2003-09-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE TO SHOW PRODUCT AND/OR PRICE INFORMATIONS

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 09F 3/20 A, 7G 09F 7/06 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI