Global patent index - EP 0973145 A1

EP 0973145 A1 2000-01-19 - Method and system for processing digital images resulting from auxiliary graphical elements blended in main images

Title (en)

Method and system for processing digital images resulting from auxiliary graphical elements blended in main images

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Verarbeitung von digitalen Bildern resultierend aus der Einblendung von graphischen Zuzatselementen in Hauptbilder

Title (fr)

Procédé et système d'élaboration d'images numériques résultant d'éléments graphiques auxiliaires incrustés dans des images principales

Publication

EP 0973145 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401725 A

Priority

FR 9809158 A

Abstract (en)

The method involve data being decoded in real time, with the data comprising an auxiliary array of data defining the auxiliary image. For each successive principle image the values of chrominance and luminance, that are to be mixed with the pixels of the principal embedded image, are supplied without having to be determined for each image.

Abstract (fr)

On décode au vol les données comprimées d'un flot auxiliaire de données définissant ladite image auxiliaire, au cours de l'affichage de chaque image principale dans laquelle cette image auxiliaire doit être incrustée, de façon à délivrer successivement au cours de chaque décodage de l'image auxiliaire, pour les pixels successifs de cette image auxiliaire, des valeurs de luminance et de chrominance (Ya, Ua, Va) destinées à être mélangées avec celles (Yp, Up, Vp) des pixels homologues de l'image principale en cours d'affichage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 1/16; G06T 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/42 (2013.01); G09G 2340/02 (2013.01); G09G 2340/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973145 A1 20000119; FR 2781326 A1 20000121; FR 2781326 B1 20000929; US 6414722 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100923

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070308

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI