Global Patent Index - EP 0973146 A1

EP 0973146 A1 2000-01-19 - Small size display apparatus together with scrolling and proportional spacing character display method

Title (en)

Small size display apparatus together with scrolling and proportional spacing character display method

Title (de)

Kleines Anzeigegerät mit Verschiebungs- und zeichenproportionalen Abstands-Anzeigeverfahren

Title (fr)

Système d'affichage de petite taille ainsi que méthode d'affichage de caractères avec défilement et espacement proportionnel

Publication

EP 0973146 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305652 A

Priority

  • EP 98305652 A
  • JP 1383297 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the invention is to implement an information display apparatus that is able to easily read a large amount of information even on a compact-sized display unit by improving a display mode in the display unit. In displaying characters on a liquid crystal display panel (3) used for an information display apparatus (1), characters, such as "w", "i", and "n", have different widths by amounts of five dots, one dot, and four dots, respectively. Even with the above amount of dots, the characters are sufficiently legible. Accordingly, characters are displayed with only minimal widths required for identifying them, and furthermore, only a limited space is interposed within the characters. In displaying English words, a word is not broken across two lines to begin a new line. A fixed display method is used when an amount of information to be displayed is not greater than four lines. On the other hand, when an amount of information to be displayed exceeds four lines, scroll display is automatically repeated three times, as well as informing that the amount of information exceeds four lines. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20; G09G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/32 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 5/34 (2006.01); H04M 11/02 (2006.01); H04Q 7/14 (2006.01); G09G 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 5/26 (2013.01); G09G 5/34 (2013.01); G09G 2340/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973146 A1 20000119; JP H10207445 A 19980807

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080621

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI