Global patent index - EP 0973149 A2

EP 0973149 A2 2000-01-19 - Ultrasonic transducers

Title (en)

Ultrasonic transducers

Title (de)

Ultraschallwandlern

Title (fr)

Transducteurs ultrasonores

Publication

EP 0973149 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305633 A

Priority

  • US 11627198 A
  • US 30020099 A

Abstract (en)

Sonic transducers utilize resonant cavities of varying depths to achieve wide operational bandwidth. The transducers (29) may include a conductive membrane (38) spaced apart from one or more backplate electrodes (32a,32b). In one approach, spacing is achieved using a dielectric spacer (34) having a series of depressions (36) arranged in a pattern, the depressions forming cavities each resonant at a predetermined frequency. In another approach, the conductive membrane (62) is piezoelectrically active, and the transducer is simultaneously driven in both piezoelectric and electrostatic modes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 9/12; G01H 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 17/10 (2006.01); B06B 1/02 (2006.01); B06B 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0688 (2013.01); B06B 1/0292 (2013.01); B06B 1/0614 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3816671 A
  • [A] GB 1234767 A
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 027 (E-294), 6 February 1985 (1985-02-06) & JP 59 171300 A (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK), 27 September 1984 (1984-09-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973149 A2 20000119; EP 0973149 A3 20001227; JP 2000050392 A 20000218; JP 4294798 B2 20090715

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020725

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010626

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7G 10K 9/12 A, 7G 01H 11/06 B, 7B 06B 1/02 B

2000-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POMPEI, FRANK JOSEPH

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI