Global Patent Index - EP 0973183 A2

EP 0973183 A2 2000-01-19 - Drive device for an isolating switch

Title (en)

Drive device for an isolating switch

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung zur Betätigung eines Trennschalters

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour un sectionneur

Publication

EP 0973183 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113484 A

Priority

DE 29812474 U

Abstract (en)

The breaker switch has a housing (2) containing at least one setting element (1), an electrohydraulic force generation and transmission device, for movement of the setting element and a control device. The force generation and transmission device may employ an electric drive motor (7), a hydraulic pump (8) and a hydraulic cylinder (3) coupled to the switch setting element, the motor operated by the control device upon reception of a remote control signal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Trennschalter mit einem Gehäuse, in welchem wenigstens ein Stellglied, eine Krafterzeugungs- und -übertragungseinheit zur Bewegung des Stellgliedes und eine Steuereinheit angeordnet sind, wobei die Krafterzeugungs- und -übertragungseinheit elektrohydraulisch ausgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/24 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/24 (2013.01); H01H 31/00 (2013.01); H01H 2300/056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812474 U1 19981112; AT 348398 T 20070115; DE 59914049 D1 20070125; EP 0973183 A2 20000119; EP 0973183 A3 20001108; EP 0973183 B1 20061213

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914049

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914049 P 20070125

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PUETZ, SIEGFRIED

2006-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTEC GMBH TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS

2006-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONTEC GMBH TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS

2006-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DRIVE DEVICE FOR AN ISOLATING SWITCH

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI