Global patent index - EP 0973231 A2

EP 0973231 A2 2000-01-19 - Dual polarization directional antenna having choke reflectors for minimizing side lobe

Title (en)

Dual polarization directional antenna having choke reflectors for minimizing side lobe

Title (de)

Dualpolarisierte Richtantenne mit Drosselreflektoren zur Minimisierung von Seitenkeulen

Title (fr)

Antenne directive à double polarisation avec des réflecteurs d'étranglement pour minimiser le rayonnement latéral

Publication

EP 0973231 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99810600 A

Priority

KR 19980027126 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is to provide a dual polarization directional antenna having choke reflectors for minimizing side lobe, including, a first reflection means for reflecting radiation energy; a plurality of radiation means for radiating energy in order to develop dual-polarization, the radiation means being arranged on the first reflection means; a main-power divider being supplied electric power from outer side power source thereof and distributing the electric power to each of the radiation means in a predetermined ratio; a plurality of sub-power dividers for transmitting the electric power distributed by the main-power divider to each of the radiation means; and a plurality of second reflection means for filtering and reflecting the energy radiated from the radiation means, and the reflection means being disposed on the first reflection means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/10; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/52; H01Q 3/20; H01Q 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/52 (2006.01); H01Q 3/20 (2006.01); H01Q 15/00 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/108 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 1/523 (2013.01); H01Q 3/20 (2013.01); H01Q 21/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973231 A2 20000119; EP 0973231 A3 20010425; KR 100269584 B1 20001016; KR 20000007676 A 20000207

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 21/10 A, 7H 01Q 19/10 B, 7H 01Q 3/20 B, 7H 01Q 1/52 B, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 21/24 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI