Global patent index - EP 0973232 A2

EP 0973232 A2 2000-01-19 - Electrical contact for contacting a foil conductor

Title (en)

Electrical contact for contacting a foil conductor

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kontakt zum kontaktieren einer Leiterfolie

Title (fr)

Contact électrique pour mise en contact avec un conducteur à feuille

Publication

EP 0973232 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113247 A

Priority

  • EP 99113247 A
  • EP 98113332 A
  • EP 99107572 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical contact for making contact with a foil conductor surrounded by an insulating foil layer, that has a contacting section (2) with a baseplate (4) with at least one protruding section (5) and at least one lateral lug (6) attached to the baseplate (4), where the lug is basically arranged at right angles to the baseplate (4), capable of piercing through the foil and having a lateral section that can be bent over onto the foil, the lateral section being provided with a lower edge (9) which is separated from the baseplate (4) by a slot and with the lateral section being bendable over to make contact between the foil conductor and the middle section (7), wherein by the bending action, the insulating foil layer on top of the foil conductor is stripped off the foil which is located between the protruding section (5) and the lower edge (9) of the lateral section (8) thus establishing electrical contact with the foil conductor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/18; H01R 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2495 (2013.01); H01R 12/68 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973232 A2 20000119; EP 0973232 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 4/18 A, 7H 01R 12/08 B, 7H 01R 4/24 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI