Global patent index - EP 0973280 A2

EP 0973280 A2 2000-01-19 - A method and a device for reducing interference

Title (en)

A method and a device for reducing interference

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reduktion von Störungen

Title (fr)

Procedé et dispositif pour reduction de bruit

Publication

EP 0973280 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112461 A

Priority

FI 981604 A

Abstract (en)

The balancing of the antenna (AER2) of a mobile station card and an antenna interface (LNA) interrupts the access of interference (E) formed in the chassis of the electronic device acting as the host of the mobile station card through the antenna interface to disturb the radio reception of the mobile station card. The antenna has two elements that are placed to receive the interference emitted by a computer in a symmetric way. The antenna interface is balanced using a balun (Ba) or a differential antenna amplifier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 15/00; H01Q 1/24; H04B 1/12; H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973280 A2 20000119; EP 0973280 A3 20031203; FI 105298 B 20000714; FI 981604 A0 19980714; FI 981604 A 20000115

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-09-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 1/24 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/12 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/38 B

2003-12-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 15/00 A

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI