Global Patent Index - EP 0973285 A2

EP 0973285 A2 2000-01-19 - Broadcast receiver for an automobile, in particular a broadcast receiver for receiving broadcasting signals comprising supplementary signals

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver for an automobile, in particular a broadcast receiver for receiving broadcasting signals comprising supplementary signals

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger für ein Fahrzeug, insbesondere Rundfunkempfänger für den Empfang von mit Zusatzsignalen versehenen Rundfunksignalen

Title (fr)

Récepteur de radiodiffusion pour automobile, en particulier un récepteur pour la réception de signaux de radiodiffusion comportant des signaux supplémentaires

Publication

EP 0973285 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112383 A

Priority

DE 19831259 A

Abstract (en)

The automobile radio has a reception circuit (2) and a control device (6) for evaluating the additional radio data signals contained within the radio broadcast signals, and for determining the reception level of the received signals. The control device stores the additional signals identifying the transmitter and/or the radio transmitter reception frequency. When the reception level drops, the receiving circuit is retuned so that the normal reception level is restored.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Rundfunkempfänger für ein Fahrzeug, insbesondere einen Rundfunkempfänger für den Empfang von mit Zusatzsignalen versehenen Rundfunksignalen in für den Rundfunkempfang problematischen Bereichen. Sollen von einem Rundfunkempfänger, beispielsweise einem Rundfunkempfänger der nach dem Radio Daten Standard (RDS) arbeitet, Rundfunksignale mit entsprechenden Zusatzsignalen empfangen werden, treten insbesondere in Bereichen wie Unterführungen, Tunnels oder Garagen Probleme wegen der Abschattung der Rundfunksignale auf. Bei der vorliegenden Erfindung werden diese Probleme dadurch vermieden, daß durch die Abspeicherung der den Sender kennzeichnenden Zusatzinformationen, bzw. der Empfangsfrequenz des Senders, dieser auch nach einer Unterbrechung, wie z. B. durch eine Abschattung der Rundfunksignale verursacht, wieder eingestellt und empfangen werden kann. Dadurch werden störende Senderwechsel vermieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/57 (2008.01); H04H 60/11 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/11 (2013.01); H04H 20/57 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973285 A2 20000119; EP 0973285 A3 20041201; DE 19831259 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-07-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG CAR INTERMEDIA SYSTEM GMBH

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI