Global Patent Index - EP 0973359 A3

EP 0973359 A3 2002-11-13 - Electronic ballast with inrush current limitation

Title (en)

Electronic ballast with inrush current limitation

Title (de)

Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät mit Einschaltstrombegrenzung

Title (fr)

Ballast électronique avec limitation du courant d'appel

Publication

EP 0973359 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111406 A

Priority

DE 19830368 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0973359A2] The inverter (2) has a converter network (T1/1, T1/2, C1, SW3, SW4), arranged between a DC voltage potential (U+) or reference potential (Uref), with two bridge branches, which in a stationary condition are put through alternatively on the reference potential. Also the switch network is formed by limiting the switched ON current by a limit resistance (R1) which lies in series with the storage capacitor (C2), with a further connection at reference potential. The connecting point of the storage capacitor is coupled with limit resistance with the two bridge branches of the converter network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/285; H02H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/285 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2856 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973359 A2 20000119; EP 0973359 A3 20021113; EP 0973359 B1 20040825; CA 2276913 A1 20000107; CA 2276913 C 20080902; DE 19830368 A1 20000203; US 6078144 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910327 P 20040930

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/285 A, 7H 02H 9/00 B

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI