Global patent index - EP 0973394 A1

EP 0973394 A1 2000-01-26 - NUCLEIC ACID AND AMINO ACID SEQUENCES RELATING TO $i(HELICOBACTER PYLORI) AND VACCINE COMPOSITIONS THEREOF

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACID AND AMINO ACID SEQUENCES RELATING TO $i(HELICOBACTER PYLORI) AND VACCINE COMPOSITIONS THEREOF

Title (de)

AUF HELIOBACTER PYLORI BEZOGENE NUKLEIN- UND AMINOSÄURESEQUENZEN SOWIE DIESE ENTHALTENDE IMPFSTOFFE

Title (fr)

ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET SEQUENCES D'ACIDES AMINES RELATIFS A HELICOBACTER PYLORI, ET COMPOSITIONS DE VACCINS LES CONTENANT

Publication

EP 0973394 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913847 A

Priority

  • US 9719575 W
  • US 73915096 A
  • US 75973996 A
  • US 89192897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818323A1] Recombinant or substantially pure preparations of H. pylori polypeptides are described. The nucleic acids encoding the polypeptides also are described. The H. pylori polypeptides are useful for diagnostics and vaccine compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/31; A61K 39/106; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/205; C07K 19/00; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 39/106 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 14/205 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/205 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9416714 A1
  • [A] SCHMITT W ET AL: "GENETIC ANALYSIS OF THE HELICOBACTER PYLORI VACUOLATING CYTOTOXIN: STRUCTURAL SIMILARITIES WITH THE IGA PROTEASE TYPE OF EXPORTED PROTEIN" MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC, OXFORD, GB, vol. 12, no. 2, 1 April 1994 (1994-04-01), pages 307-319, XP000605827 ISSN: 0950-382X
  • [XP] JEAN-F. TOMB ET AL.: "The complete genome sequence of the gastric pathogen Helicobacter pylori" NATURE, vol. 389, 25 September 1997 (1997-09-25), pages 539-547, XP002303938 & DATABASE UniProt Entry O25218 1 January 1998 (1998-01-01), TOMB, J.-F. ET AL.: "Outer membrane protein (Omp11)" Database accession no. O25218
  • [XP] DATABASE EMBL Entry HPAC108 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31), AKOPYANTS, N.S. ET AL.: "Helicobacter pylori cosmid clone 36, complete sequence" XP002303939 Database accession no. AC000108
  • See also references of WO 9818323A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818323 A1 19980507; AR 009600 A1 20000426; AU 5093398 A 19980522; AU 734052 B2 20010531; BR 9712587 A 19991026; CA 2265523 A1 19980507; CN 1235513 A 19991117; EE 9900176 A 19991215; EP 0973394 A1 20000126; EP 0973394 A4 20050330; ID 22065 A 19990826; IL 129397 D0 20000217; IS 5005 A 19990318; JP 2001504329 A 20010403; KR 20000052831 A 20000825; NO 991995 A 19990628; NO 991995 D0 19990427; NZ 334568 A 20000428; PL 333169 A1 19991122; SK 34699 A3 20000410; TR 9900940 T2 19990921

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1024597

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-03-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/106 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/205 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 19/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/31 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 B

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: NUCLEIC ACID AND AMINO ACID SEQUENCES RELATING TO HELICOBACTER PYLORI AND VACCINE COMPOSITIONS THEREOF

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990528

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19990528;LV PAYMENT 19990528;RO PAYMENT 19990528;SI PAYMENT 19990528