Global patent index - EP 0973424 A1

EP 0973424 A1 2000-01-26 - ELASTIC DEVICE ACTING AS INTERFACE BETWEEN A LATH JOINING PIECE AND A REST BAR FRAME

Title (en)

ELASTIC DEVICE ACTING AS INTERFACE BETWEEN A LATH JOINING PIECE AND A REST BAR FRAME

Title (de)

ELASTISCHES VERBINDUNGSELEMENT EINER LATTE MIT EINEM BETTGESTELL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELASTIQUE FAISANT OFFICE D'INTERFACE ENTRE UN EMBOUT DE LATTE ET LE CADRE DU SOMMIER

Publication

EP 0973424 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97953965 A

Priority

  • FR 9702442 W
  • FR 9700128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2758068A1] The invention concerns an elastic device placed between the girder (1) of a rest bar frame and the joining piece (2), preferably at the shoulder recess. Said elastic device comprises a fixed plate (5), backed on to the internal face of the girder (1), a supporting plate (7) associated with said plate (5) by means of a T-shaped catch, mobile with respect to the latter and guided in a groove (14) in the form of an elongated slot. An elastic member (11) is placed between the two plates, fixed at its lower part on said plate by means of a pin (12). All the elements of this supporting device are made in a suitable plastic material and the hardness of the elastic member (11) is chosen according to requirements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829009A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758068 A1 19980710; FR 2758068 B1 19990326; AU 5769098 A 19980731; DE 69709910 D1 20020228; DE 69709910 T2 20020912; EP 0973424 A1 20000126; EP 0973424 B1 20020102; ES 2168688 T3 20020616; WO 9829009 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021230

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *DELAHOUSSE ET FILS

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-12-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021216

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168688

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69709910

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020228

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI