Global patent index - EP 0973425 A1

EP 0973425 A1 2000-01-26 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR QUICK SUBSTANTIALLY COMPLETE DEFLATING AND EMPTYING OF AN INFLATABLE CHAMBER, IN PARTICULAR A SUPPORT DEVICE CHAMBER SUCH AS A MATTRESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR QUICK SUBSTANTIALLY COMPLETE DEFLATING AND EMPTYING OF AN INFLATABLE CHAMBER, IN PARTICULAR A SUPPORT DEVICE CHAMBER SUCH AS A MATTRESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM SCHNELLEN ENTLEEREN EINER LUFTKAMMER, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE KÖRPERSTÜTZE WIE EINE MATRATZE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DEGONFLAGE RAPIDE ET DE VIDAGE SENSIBLEMENT TOTAL D'UNE CHAMBRE GONFLABLE, EN PARTICULIER UNE CHAMBRE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT, TEL QU'UN MATELAS

Publication

EP 0973425 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914947 A

Priority

  • FR 9800549 W
  • FR 9703331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2760967A1] The invention concerns a method and an apparatus for quick deflating of a chamber. Said apparatus (210) for quick deflating of a chamber (213) inflatable with an inflating fluid, said chamber having a predetermined inflating volume, comprising means for inflating said chamber inflatable with an inflating fluid at a predetermined inflating pressure is characterised in that it further comprises means (220) for quick deflating of said chamber (213) by suction of said inflating fluid at a high rate, said quick deflating means (220) being implemented when said chamber (213) is deactivated in particular to be transported with its reduced volume reduced to a minimum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10; A47C 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/05776 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841128A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760967 A1 19980925; FR 2760967 B1 19990806; AT 206024 T 20011015; AU 6925398 A 19981012; BR 9808618 A 20000516; CA 2283946 A1 19980924; CA 2283946 C 20060905; DE 69801817 D1 20011031; DE 69801817 T2 20020411; EP 0973425 A1 20000126; EP 0973425 B1 20010926; ES 2165153 T3 20020301; JP 2001516241 A 20010925; US 5947168 A 19990907; WO 9841128 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090319

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090320

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090320

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090319

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-09-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2165153

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69801817

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011031

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 206024

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20011015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL