Global patent index - EP 0973477 A1

EP 0973477 A1 2000-01-26 - SUPPORT FRAME FOR SUPINE PERSONS

Title (en)

SUPPORT FRAME FOR SUPINE PERSONS

Title (de)

TRAGGESTELL FÜR LIEGENDE PERSONEN

Title (fr)

CADRE DE SUPPORT DE PERSONNES EN DECUBITUS DORSAL

Publication

EP 0973477 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959069 A

Priority

  • GB 9803739 W
  • GB 9726420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930664A1] A frame for the support of supine persons comprises a rigid rectangular frame carrying a plurality of parallel rods attached to and crossing the space between the two longer sides of the frame. The rods form four groups located in the position of the cervical, thoracic, lumbar and pelvic regions of the body. The groups of rods located in the cervical, thoracic and lumbar regions carry a pair of barrel shaped or spherical support members on each rod rigidly fixed to or integral with the rod and space equidistantly about the longitudinal axis of the frame and extending upwardly above the edges of the frame. The rods and support members are mounted so that the upper surfaces of the support members are raised above the sides of the frame. In one embodiment the rods carrying the support members are mounted or constructed in a manner that permits limited movement in a vertical plane. The rods, support members and frame are preferably constructed from timber such as beech. The preferred spacing between the centres of each pair of support members is 75 mm and the spacing between the two longer sides of the frame is 220 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 1/00; A47C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/12 (2006.01); A61H 1/00 (2006.01); A61H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/123 (2013.01); A61H 2015/0021 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0138 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0142 (2013.01); A61H 2203/0456 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930664A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930664 A1 19990624; DE 69832476 D1 20051229; DE 69832476 T2 20061214; DE 69832476 T9 20070405; EP 0973477 A1 20000126; EP 0973477 B1 20051123; GB 2333036 A 19990714; GB 2333036 B 20010131; GB 9726420 D0 19980211; GB 9827442 D0 19990210

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69832476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: LUKLINSKA, ZOFIA

- Free Format Text: LUKLINSKA, ZOFIA#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKI, MARTIN#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKA, KATRINA#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKI, BOHDAN MIROSLAW#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) -TRANSFER TO- LUKLINSKA, ZOFIA#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKI, MARTIN#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKA, KATRINA#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB) $ LUKLINSKI, BOHDAN MIROSLAW#31 MERROW WOODS#GUILDFORD GU1 2LQ (GB)

2011-01-21 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EERR

- Free Format Text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 06/42 - 3.2.

2011-01-21 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EERR

- Free Format Text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 07/02 - 3.2.

2010-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RENTSCH & PARTNER;FRAUMUENSTERSTRASSE 9, POSTFACH 2441;8022 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-08-25 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2006-07-21 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2006-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 26.04.2006 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2006-03-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-02-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060223

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69832476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051229

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI NL SE

2005-11-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-11-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-11-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI NL SE