Global patent index - EP 0973502 A1

EP 0973502 A1 2000-01-26 - LIPOPHILIC BINARY SYSTEMS FOR THE ADMINISTRATION OF LIPOPHILIC COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

LIPOPHILIC BINARY SYSTEMS FOR THE ADMINISTRATION OF LIPOPHILIC COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

LIPOPHILE BINÄRSYSTEMEN FÜR DIE VERARBREICHUNG VON LIPOPHILE KOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES LIPOPHILES BINAIRES PERMETTANT L'ADMINISTRATION DE COMPOSES LIPOPHILES

Publication

EP 0973502 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909159 A

Priority

  • US 9804899 W
  • US 82039297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840051A1] Binary pharmaceutical formulations comprising (i) a cyclosporine compound, (ii) a lipophilic phase and (iii) a surfactant provide bioavailability of the active ingredient which is equivalent to that provided by ternary compositions, but without the need for a hydrophilic phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/107; A61K 9/48; A61K 38/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 38/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840051A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840051 A1 19980917; CA 2283780 A1 19980917; EP 0973502 A1 20000126; JP 2001515491 A 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010815

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ALANI, LAMAN, A.

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CONSTANTINIDES, PANAYIOTIS, PERICLEOUS

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GAO, RONG

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAUL, DILIP

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIPARI, JOHN, M.

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAZER, TERRENCE, B.

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCHESNEY-HARRIS, LISA, L.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AL-RAZZAK, LAMAN, A.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CONSTANTINIDES, PANAYIOTIS, PERICLEOUS

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GAO, RONG

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAUL, DILIP

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIPARI, JOHN, M.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAZER, TERRENCE, B.

2000-08-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCHESNEY-HARRIS, LISA, L.

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE