Global patent index - EP 0973503 A2

EP 0973503 A2 2000-01-26 - NON-AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (en)

NON-AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION

Title (de)

NICHT-WÄSSRIGE ORAL ANZUWENDENDE ARZNEIZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS NON AQUEUSES POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE

Publication

EP 0973503 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98916998 A

Priority

  • EP 9801580 W
  • GB 9705813 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842319A2] Essentially non-aqueous compositions suitable for oral administration comprising a biologically active oil or an oil-soluble ingredient or a biologically active oil or an oil-soluble ingredient as a dispersion in a suitable carrier oil, dispersed in a physiologically acceptable emulsifier or emulsifier mixture having an HLB (hydrophilic/lipophilic balance) value of between 10 and 18 and encapsulated in a capsule material that is soluble in gastric juice, their production and use in the maintenance and/or promotion of health.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/107; A61K 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 9/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842319A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842319 A2 19981001; WO 9842319 A3 19981217; AU 7037198 A 19981020; EP 0973503 A2 20000126; GB 9705813 D0 19970507; ZA 9802334 B 19981201

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025509

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020715

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990913