Global patent index - EP 0973513 A1

EP 0973513 A1 2000-01-26 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING BONE DEFICIT CONDITIONS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING BONE DEFICIT CONDITIONS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KNOCHENMANGELERSCHEINUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES POUR TRAITER LES ETATS ASSOCIES A UN DEFICIT OSSEUX

Publication

EP 0973513 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97912787 A

Priority

  • US 9718864 W
  • US 73631896 A
  • US 73587396 A
  • US 73588196 A
  • US 73622296 A
  • US 73622196 A
  • US 73587096 A
  • US 73587696 A
  • US 73622096 A
  • US 73631996 A
  • US 73587496 A
  • US 73622896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817267A1] Compounds containing two aromatic systems covalently linked through a linker containing one or more atoms, or "linker" defined as including a covalent bond per se so as to space the aromatic systems at a distance 1.5-15 ANGSTROM , are effective in treating conditions associated with bone deficits. The compounds can be administered to vertebrate subjects alone or in combination with additional agents that promote bone growth or that inhibit bone resorption. They can be screened for activity prior to administration by assessing their ability to effect the transcription of a reporter gene coupled to a promoter associated with a bone morphogenetic protein and/or their ability to stimulate calvarial growth in model animal systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/165; A61K 31/215; A61K 31/33; A61K 31/405; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/42; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/74 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/136 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/196 (2006.01); A61K 31/215 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/428 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/498 (2006.01); A61K 31/502 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/535 (2006.01); A61K 31/5415 (2006.01); A61K 31/549 (2006.01); A61K 31/655 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); C07C 49/84 (2006.01); C07C 69/92 (2006.01); C07C 225/32 (2006.01); C07C 233/55 (2006.01); C07C 233/59 (2006.01); C07C 233/80 (2006.01); C07C 235/38 (2006.01); C07C 237/20 (2006.01); C07C 243/22 (2006.01); C07C 243/32 (2006.01); C07C 243/34 (2006.01); C07C 243/38 (2006.01); C07C 245/08 (2006.01); C07C 251/20 (2006.01); C07C 251/28 (2006.01); C07C 251/48 (2006.01); C07C 251/66 (2006.01); C07C 251/86 (2006.01); C07C 259/10 (2006.01); C07C 311/39 (2006.01); C07C 323/62 (2006.01); C07C 337/06 (2006.01); C07D 213/53 (2006.01); C07D 213/76 (2006.01); C07D 213/78 (2006.01); C07D 213/85 (2006.01); C07D 215/12 (2006.01); C07D 215/38 (2006.01); C07D 235/08 (2006.01); C07D 235/22 (2006.01); C07D 241/42 (2006.01); C07D 265/16 (2006.01); C07D 277/20 (2006.01); C07D 277/56 (2006.01); C07D 277/64 (2006.01); C07D 277/82 (2006.01); C07D 279/16 (2006.01); C07D 285/16 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/655 (2013.01); A61K 31/196 (2013.01); A61K 31/4184 (2013.01); A61K 31/428 (2013.01); A61K 31/444 (2013.01); A61K 31/47 (2013.01); A61K 31/4709 (2013.01); A61K 31/498 (2013.01); A61K 31/517 (2013.01); A61K 31/53 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817267 A1 19980430; AU 4988997 A 19980515; EP 0973513 A1 20000126; EP 0973513 A4 20030319; JP 2001510450 A 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040909

2003-03-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030205

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOARD OF REGENTS UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSTEOSCREEN, INC.

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZYMOGENETICS, INC.

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990512

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE