Global Patent Index - EP 0973523 A1

EP 0973523 A1 2000-01-26 - ANTI-MICROBIAL PRODUCT

Title (en)

ANTI-MICROBIAL PRODUCT

Title (de)

ANTIMIKROBIELLE KOMBINATION VON FLAVONOID UND ANTIBIOTIKA

Title (fr)

PRODUIT ANTIMICROBIEN

Publication

EP 0973523 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98905514 A

Priority

  • GB 9800512 W
  • GB 9703532 A
  • GB 9726401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836750A1] A product comprises, for simultaneous, separate or sequential administration, a flavonoid of formula (I), or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof; and an antibiotic. The flavonoid may be present in such an amount so as to potentiate the action of the antibiotic. When the antibiotic is a beta -lactam antibiotic, the resulting medicament may be used for treating or preventing bacterial infections which are at least partially resistant to treatment by the beta -lactam antibiotic alone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/545; A61K 31/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/353 (2006.01); A61K 31/43 (2006.01); A61K 31/545 (2006.01); A61K 36/18 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/43 (2013.01); A61K 31/545 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/545 + A61K 31/35
  2. A61K 31/43 + A61K 31/35
  3. A61K 31/43 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/545 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836750A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836750 A1 19980827; AU 6108198 A 19980909; AU 726471 B2 20001109; BR 9807444 A 20000425; CA 2281524 A1 19980827; EP 0973523 A1 20000126; GB 9726401 D0 19980211; JP 2001512473 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020212

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICHARDS, ROBERT MICHAEL EDWARD

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DURHAM, DAVID GARNET

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIU, IAIN XIAOJUN

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/545 A, 7A 61K 31/43 B, 7A 61K 31/545 J, 7A 61K 31:35 J, 7A 61K 31/43 K, 7A 61K 31:35 K, 7A 61P 31:00 K

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE