Global patent index - EP 0973551 A2

EP 0973551 A2 2000-01-26 - POLYMERIC CONJUGATES POLYVALENTLY PRESENTING AN AGENT FOR THERAPY

Title (en)

POLYMERIC CONJUGATES POLYVALENTLY PRESENTING AN AGENT FOR THERAPY

Title (de)

POLYMERE KONJUGATE DIE MEHRERE THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL PRESENTIEREN

Title (fr)

MOLECULES PRESENTANT UNE PLURALITE DE GROUPES FONCTIONNELS ACTIFS

Publication

EP 0973551 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98918079 A

Priority

  • US 9807171 W
  • US 4378197 P
  • US 4382697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846270A2] Pharmaceutical compositions for polyvalently presenting an agent for therapy are described. The pharmaceutical compositions contain a polyvalent presenter. In one embodiment, the polyvalent presenter has a formula as follows: (Y)-(X-A)n, wherein Y is a framework, X is a direct bond or a linker, A is a presented functional group, and n is greater than ten and is an integer selected such that the presented groups can interact with a plurality of target binding sites. The composition also can include a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier. Alternatively, the presenter itself can serve as its own pharmaceutically acceptable carrier. Methods for treating diseases or conditions also are described. The methods involve administering to a subject a plurality of groups A such that the treatment occurs. The treatment occurs by the interaction of a polyvalent presenter with a plurality of target binding sites B. Other aspects of the invention include polyvalent presenters packaged with instructions for use in the aforementioned methods and methods for designing polyvalent presenters which are useful within the methods of this invention. The polyvalent presenters disclosed herein provide for specificity in binding, which has a number of advantages. Furthermore, the polyvalent presenters permit positive and negative interactions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/48; C07H 13/04; G01N 33/543

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 9/51 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/38 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 15/18 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); C07H 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 15/12 (2013.01); A61K 47/48 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00756 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846270A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846270 A2 19981022; WO 9846270 A3 19990107; AU 7106998 A 19981111; AU 743028 B2 20020117; BR 9808521 A 20000523; CA 2286692 A1 19981022; CN 1269013 A 20001004; EP 0973551 A2 20000126; JP 2002503223 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WHITESIDES, GEORGE

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANANBAUM, JAMES, B.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GRIFFIN, JOHN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAMMEN, MATHAI

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020923

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCED MEDICINE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WHITESIDES, GEORGE

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANANBAUM, JAMES, B.

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GRIFFIN, JOHN

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAMMEN, MATHAI

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE