Global patent index - EP 0973560 A1

EP 0973560 A1 2000-01-26 - SURGICAL SITE PREPARATION COMPOSITION FOR A SKIN SURFACE

Title (en)

SURGICAL SITE PREPARATION COMPOSITION FOR A SKIN SURFACE

Title (de)

MITTEL ZUR VORBEREITUNG DER HAUTOBERFLÄCHE BEI CHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFFEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION SERVANT A PREPARER LE CHAMP OPERATOIRE SUR LA SURFACE DE LA PEAU

Publication

EP 0973560 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913324 A

Priority

  • US 9806317 W
  • US 82394897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5763412A] An antimicrobial film forming surgical site preparation composition includes a film forming material and an antimicrobial agent soluble in a fugitive solvent. The composition when applied to the skin surface forms a substantially water insoluble, substantially tack-free flexible film adherent to the skin surface. The film is capable of releasably retaining the antimicrobial agent to substantially inhibit microbial growth on the skin surface. The film releases sufficient antimicrobial agent to substantially eliminate the microorganisms normally present on the skin surface to prepare the surface for the procedure and continues to release the antimicrobial agent during the procedure and subsequent wound healing. The composition can be easily washed from fabric and does not stain the fabric even where the fabric is treated with chlorine bleach. In addition, a smooth continuous film is formed without the use of a separate plasticizer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 26/00; A61K 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 15/44 (2006.01); A01N 47/44 (2006.01); A61L 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 47/44 (2013.01); A61L 26/0023 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 47/44 + A01N 25/24
  2. A01N 47/44 + A01N 2300/00
  3. A61L 26/0023 + C08L 1/26

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844962A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5763412 A 19980609; AT 224212 T 20021015; BR 9808485 A 20000523; BR 9808485 B1 20110531; CA 2285967 A1 19981015; CA 2285967 C 20070612; CN 1136014 C 20040128; CN 1255865 A 20000607; DE 69808059 D1 20021024; DE 69808059 T2 20030522; DK 0973560 T3 20021014; EP 0973560 A1 20000126; EP 0973560 B1 20020918; ES 2184246 T3 20030401; JP 2001523122 A 20011120; JP 4450871 B2 20100414; PT 973560 E 20021129; WO 9844962 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160304

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BECTON DICKINSON AND CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-04-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184246

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-17 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-06 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020404228

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69808059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 224212

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61L 26/00 A, 7A 61K 9/70 B

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011114

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991014

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE